Farmer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Brian Keith Farmer
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv01548
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James P Donohue
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Lu on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Lu, Ryan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Commissioner Social Security on 11/2/2018, filed by Plaintiff Brian Keith Farmer. (Saar, Lisa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security, c/o AG. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Office of Regional Chief Counsel)(TF)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Brian Keith Farmer.(TF)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Pltf's #1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. James P. Donohue. (TF)
October 22, 2018 Hon. James P. Donohue added. (SNP)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Brian Keith Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Assistant US Attorney, #5 Summons Office of General Counsel)(Saar, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Ryan Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Farmer
Represented By: Lisa Saar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?