SEO Development LLC et al v. Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP et al
Plaintiff: Ann Anderson, Edwin Xavier Vicioso and SEO Development LLC
Defendant: Ryan Espegard, Lee Owens and Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP
Case Number: 2:2018cv01551
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 19 JUDGMENT BY COURT: Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See Order (Dkt. #18 ).) (SWT)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs' complaint without prejudice because Plaintiffs failed to demonstrate the court's subject matter jurisdiction; declining to consider Defendants' #14 MOTION Strike Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs Ann Anderson, SEO Development LLC, Edwin Xavier Vicioso (Pelley, Aaron)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Defendants Ryan Espegard, Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP, TO RESPONSE to #14 MOTION Strike Complaint re #1 Complaint,, (Lipman, Avi)
November 13, 2018 Attorneys Robert M Sulkin, Claire Martirosian for Ryan Espegard and Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP added; per #13 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Avi J. Lipman filed by Defendants Ryan Espegard, Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP re #14 MOTION Strike Complaint re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lipman, Avi)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION Strike Complaint re #1 Complaint,, , filed by Defendants Ryan Espegard, Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/30/2018, (Lipman, Avi)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Avi J. Lipman on behalf of Defendants Ryan Espegard, Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP. (Lipman, Avi)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of filing this order why its complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Superior Court of the State of Washington for Pierce County 930 Tacoma Ave. S., Tacoma, WA 98402, case number in other court 18-2-09338-0 ; filed by Plaintiffs Ann Anderson, SEO Development LLC, Edwin Xavier Vicioso. (Goodhouse, Brendan)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on the #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew P Schriever for Ann Anderson, SEO Development LLC, and Edwin Xavier Vicioso, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on the #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Troy D Lipp for Ann Anderson, SEO Development LLC, and Edwin Xavier Vicioso, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on the #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brendan M Goodhouse for Ann Anderson, SEO Development LLC, and Edwin Xavier Vicioso, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 (1) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants Ryan Espegard, Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP, and Lee Owens. (CMG)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:18-cv-5849 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 2:18-cv-1551JLR. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorneys Guide to Opening a Civil Case to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (CMG)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Edwin Xavier Vicioso, SEO Development LLC, and Ann Anderson (Pelley, Aaron) Modified on 10/22/2018: additional plaintiffs added as filers (CMG).
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew P. Schriever FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Edwin Xavier Vicioso, SEO Development LLC, and Ann Anderson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5514348 (Pelley, Aaron) Modified on 10/22/2018: additional plaintiffs added (CMG).
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Troy D. Lipp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Edwin Xavier Vicioso, SEO Development LLC, and Ann Anderson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5514342 (Pelley, Aaron) Modified on 10/22/2018: additional plaintiffs added (CMG).
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brendan M. Goodhouse FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Edwin Xavier Vicioso, SEO Development, and Ann Anderson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5514336 (Pelley, Aaron) Modified on 10/22/2018: additional plaintiffs added (CMG).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Ann Anderson, SEO Development, Edwin Xavier Vicioso. (Pelley, Aaron)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP, Ryan Espegard, and Lee Ownen with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5514007), filed by Plaintiffs SEO Development LLC, Ann Anderson, and Edwin Xavier Vicioso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #4 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Application, #5 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Application, #6 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Application)(Pelley, Aaron) Modified on 10/22/2018: corrected the name of defendants and added filers (CMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEO Development LLC et al v. Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Anderson
Represented By: Andrew P Schriever
Represented By: Aaron A Pelley
Represented By: Brendan M Goodhouse
Represented By: Troy D Lipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Xavier Vicioso
Represented By: Andrew P Schriever
Represented By: Aaron A Pelley
Represented By: Brendan M Goodhouse
Represented By: Troy D Lipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEO Development LLC
Represented By: Andrew P Schriever
Represented By: Aaron A Pelley
Represented By: Brendan M Goodhouse
Represented By: Troy D Lipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Espegard
Represented By: Avi J. Lipman
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Thomas Honeywell LLP
Represented By: Avi J. Lipman
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?