Rough v. Chase Bank et al

Plaintiff: Douglas H Rough
Defendant: Sergei Chuchalin, Barclaycard, Chase Bank, Vitalii Volchengkov, Nikita Rubetskoy, Hector Loritz, Wells Fargo, ALN, Asian Firov and MC Medical AG
Case Number: 2:2018cv01555
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 PRAECIPE to attach document re #22 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attach Signature Page to 22)(Rough, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 PRAECIPE to attach document re #18 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attach Signature Page to 18)(Rough, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #22 Response to Motion was not signed by Douglas Rough. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (TH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant ALN. (Rough, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant ALN, Sergei Chuchalin, Asian Firov, Hector Loritz, MC Medical AG, Nikita Rubetskoy, Vitalii Volchengkov. (Attachments: #1 Summons Non Service, #2 Summons Non Service)(Rough, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough, to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Rough, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Barclays Bank on 11/15/2018, filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Barclays Summons Note)(Rough, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on JP MORGAN CHASE & CO on 11/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Chase Summons note)(Rough, Douglas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Wells Fargo on 11/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough. (Rough, Douglas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough, to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Rough, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/28/2018, (Devlin, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Wells Fargo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/4/2019, (Lyon, Wendy)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wells Fargo (Lyon, Wendy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Wendy E Lyon on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo. (Lyon, Wendy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Praecipe for a Summons by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Reissuance of summons)(Rough, Douglas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rough, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Attorney Taylor Washburn for Chase Bank added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S Devlin, III on behalf of Defendant Chase Bank. (Devlin, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Rough, Douglas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 Letter to Plaintiff from Clerk re #1 Complaint. The plaintiff contacted the ECF Help Desk and requested a copy of page 14 of the exhibit(s) in order to comply with the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. The plaintiff indicated he submitted original documents to the court and did not keep a copy for himself. As a courtesy, the Clerk emailed the plaintiff this letter and exhibit page 14 at the email address listed on the docket.
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Chase Bank (main document), Wells Fargo, Barclaycard, ALN, MC Medical AG, Asian Firov, Nikita Rubetskoy, Vitalii Volchengkov, Sergei Chuchalin (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Wells Fargo, #2 Summons issued as to Barclaycard, #3 Summons issued as to ALN, #4 Summons issued as to MC Medical AG, #5 Summons issued as to Asian Firov, #6 Summons issued as to Nikita Rubetskoy, #7 Summons issued as to Vitalii Volchengkov, #8 Summons issued as to Sergei Chuchalin) (TH)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Summons Wells Fargo, #2 Summons Barclaycard, #3 Summons ALN, #4 Summons MC-Medical AG, #5 Summons Firov, #6 Summons Rubetskoy, #7 Summons Volchengkov, #8 Summons Chuchalin)(Rough, Douglas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Douglas H Rough (Attachments: #1 Summons Wells Farg, #2 Summons Barclay, #3 Summons ALN, #4 Summons MC, #5 Summons Firov, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Rough, Douglas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document: #3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Jones. Plaintiff's name corrected. (Service of corrected image is attached) (VE)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Douglas H Rough has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail) (VE) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/29/2018) (VE).
October 23, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: Document(s) contain personal identifiers that are required to be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2, and has been administratively sealed. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Please note, page 14 of 154 of the Exhibit contains personal identifiers. cc pltf via US Mail (KB)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SNP) Modified on 10/23/2018 cc: plaintiff via US mail (SNP).
October 22, 2018 RECEIPT of CD containing photographs. (placed in one accordion folder in Seattle's Clerk's Office filing shelf) (TH)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA93005), filed by Douglas Rough. (Attachments: SEALED DOCUMENT #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SNP) Modified on 10/23/2018 to seal Exhibit - document contains personal identifiers (page 14 of 154) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rough v. Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergei Chuchalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclaycard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitalii Volchengkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikita Rubetskoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Loritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asian Firov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Medical AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H Rough
Represented By: Douglas H Rough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?