Wood v. Morgan Sound Inc
Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Defendant: Morgan Sound Inc
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01564
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Morgan Sound Inc (Lawless, Shannon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting parties' #1 Stipulated Motion for Partial Withdrawal of Reference. All pretrial matters in this case shall be decided by the Bankruptcy division but any jury trial shall be conducted by this Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 26, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/2/2018. (ST)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (ST)
October 26, 2018 Judge James L. Robart add to case. (ST)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference, filed by Defendant Morgan Sound Inc. (Receipt# 25084826) (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal/Withdrawal of Reference) Noting Date 10/26/2018,(Bankruptcy Clerk(Sea)) Modified on 10/26/2018 to include Bankruptcy filing fee receipt number. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Morgan Sound Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Sound Inc
Represented By: Richard J. Hyatt
Represented By: Shannon Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Represented By: Denice Elizabeth Moewes
Represented By: Alan Jay Wenokur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?