Viome, Inc. v. Biohm Health LLC

Plaintiff: Viome, Inc.
Defendant: Biohm Health LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01566
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LW)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Biohm Health LLC (Grady, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to the case. Cc to TSZ. (KMP)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re #9 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Biohm Health LLC. Defendant's answer due 12/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/21/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2018, Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019, Declination of consent due by 1/4/2019. (KMP)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Anderson Grady on behalf of Defendant Biohm Health LLC. (Grady, Douglas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND RELATED DEADLINES, filed by Defendant Biohm Health LLC. Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Grady, Douglas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Viome, Inc. (Paine, Nathan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Biohm Health LLC on 10/30/2018, filed by Plaintiff Viome, Inc.. (Paine, Nathan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/21/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/28/2018, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (AE)
October 24, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Viome, Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/31/2018. (GT)
October 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. Plaintiff's counsel (or Plaintiff, if pro se) is directed to serve a copy of the consent form on counsel for any party subsequently appearing within five (5) days of an appearance of counsel for that party. (AE)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 12/5/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Biohm Health LLC. (GT)
October 24, 2018 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Biohm Health LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5518573), filed by Viome, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Paine, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viome, Inc. v. Biohm Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biohm Health LLC
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viome, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?