Rydman v. Champion Petfoods USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Holly Rydman
Defendant: Champion Petfoods USA, Inc., Chamion Petfoods LP and Champion Petfoods LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv01578
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extend Answer Deadline and Modify Case Schedule, filed by Defendants Champion Petfoods LP, Champion Petfoods USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Modify Case Schedule) Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Yeung, Binah)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Coulson for Defendants Champion Petfoods LP, and Champion Petfoods USA, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Coulson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Champion Petfoods LP, Champion Petfoods USA, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5577022 (Yeung, Binah)
December 11, 2018 Attorneys Eric L Christensen, Ana M. Popp and Jonathan David Tebbs added as counsel for Defendants Champion Petfoods LP and Champion Petfoods USA, Inc. per #21 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Binah B. Yeung on behalf of Defendants Champion Petfoods LP, Champion Petfoods USA, Inc.. (Yeung, Binah)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Deadline to complete discovery on class certification is 4/11/2019; Deadline for Plaintiff to file motion for class certification is 5/16/2019. (LC)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin A Seely for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M McKany for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine Van Dyck for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin A. Seely FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5551357 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. McKany FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5551340 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine Van Dyck FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5551327 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Samuel J Adams for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gustavo F Bruckner for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samuel J. Adams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5549800 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gustavo F Bruckner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5549775 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #8 Amended Complaint and Pro Hac Vice Admission. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SWT)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Holly Rydman.(Donckers, Brendan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 18-10701-GAO; 18-06951-VMK; 18-01228-LEK-DEP; 18-01736-DOC-JPR; 18-02756-MEH, by Plaintiff Holly Rydman. (Donckers, Brendan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert K. Shelquist for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rebecca A Peterson for Plaintiff Holly Rydman, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert K. Shelquist FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528473 (Donckers, Brendan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rebecca A. Peterson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Holly Rydman (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528456 (Donckers, Brendan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Champion Petfoods LP and Champion Petfoods USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
October 29, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5523552) Attorney Brendan Wesley Donckers added to party Holly Rydman(pty:pla), filed by Holly Rydman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Champion Petfoods LP, #3 Summons Champion Petfoods USA)(Donckers, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rydman v. Champion Petfoods USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Petfoods USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: David Coulson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Jonathan David Tebbs
Represented By: Binah B. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamion Petfoods LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Petfoods LP
Represented By: Eric L Christensen
Represented By: David Coulson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Jonathan David Tebbs
Represented By: Binah B. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Rydman
Represented By: Brendan Wesley Donckers
Represented By: Kevin A Seely
Represented By: Samuel J Adams
Represented By: Rebecca A Peterson
Represented By: Steven M McKany
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Gustavo F Bruckner
Represented By: Katherine Van Dyck
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?