Prosser v. Buis et al

Plaintiff: Rickie E Prosser and Cynthia W Prosser
Defendant: Jordan Buis, Vansea Transport, LTD and Vansea Transport LTD
Case Number: 2:2018cv01598
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Attorney Joseph L Hogan for Jordan Buis, Vansea Transport LTD added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark P Scheer on behalf of Defendants Jordan Buis, Vansea Transport LTD. (Scheer, Mark)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ann Heacox Rosato for Plaintiff Rickie E Prosser from 12/21/2018 - 01/02/2019. (Rosato, Ann)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/14/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Vansea Transport, LTD (SWT)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to VANSEA TRANSPORT LTD by Plaintiff Rickie E Prosser (Rosato, Ann)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jordan Buis (ST)
November 2, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5529486) Attorney Ann Heacox Rosato added to party Rickie E Prosser(pty:pla), filed by Rickie E Prosser. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosato, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prosser v. Buis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Buis
Represented By: Joseph L Hogan
Represented By: Mark P Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vansea Transport, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vansea Transport LTD
Represented By: Joseph L Hogan
Represented By: Mark P Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie E Prosser
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia W Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?