The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta v. Basel Action Network

Plaintiff: The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta d/b/a Electronic Recycling Association and The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta
Defendant: Basel Action Network and James Puckett
Case Number: 2:2018cv01601
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint. BAN is hereby ORDERED to file, within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order, a supplemental briefing explaining to the Court (1) whether the Motion to Dismiss has been mooted by the filing of the FAC or (2) whether it intends that the arguments made in the Motion to Dismiss be applied equally to the defamation and tortious interference claims in the FAC. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
December 19, 2018 Attorney Bruce EH Johnson for James Puckett added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caesar David Kalinowski on behalf of Defendant James Puckett. (Kalinowski, Caesar)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Basel Action Network, (Attachments: #1 Summons for James Puckett) (PM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). Basel Action Network, James Puckett with JURY DEMAND, filed by The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Baldridge, J)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, filed by Defendant Basel Action Network. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Johnson, Bruce)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/24/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Basel Action Network c/o Hayley Palmer, Registered Agent on 11/8/2018, filed by Plaintiff The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta. (Baldridge, J)
November 20, 2018 Attorney Caesar David Kalinowski added as counsel for Basel Action Network per #4 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Basel Action Network (Johnson, Bruce)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bruce EH Johnson on behalf of Defendant Basel Action Network. (Johnson, Bruce)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Basel Action Network (SNP)
November 5, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta d/b/a Electronic Recycling Association (Baldridge, J)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Basel Action Network with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5530317) Attorney J Douglas Baldridge added to party The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta d/b/a Electronic Recycling Association(pty:pla), filed by The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta d/b/a Electronic Recycling Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/10/2018 Report, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Baldridge, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta v. Basel Action Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basel Action Network
Represented By: Caesar David Kalinowski
Represented By: Bruce EH Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Puckett
Represented By: Caesar David Kalinowski
Represented By: Bruce EH Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta d/b/a Electronic Recycling Association
Represented By: J Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electronic Recycling Association of Alberta
Represented By: J Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?