Jones v. Jacquez

Petitioner: Bruce M. Jones II and Bruce M Jones, II
Respondent: FDC Warden I. Jacquez
Case Number: 2:2018cv01614
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Robert S Lasnik
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re petitioner's federal habeas petition and #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Bruce M Jones, II. Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2019, Noting Date 1/25/2019. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to petitioner on 12/28/18. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Judgment)(GB)
November 21, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Bruce M Jones, II. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition, #3 Affidavit of Petitioner, #4 Exhibit to Affidavit, #5 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
November 21, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter (ST)
November 6, 2018 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 12/6/2018 to correct (ST)
November 5, 2018 2 **DISREGARD** LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (mailed to petitioner via USPS) (ST) Modified as petitioner should have been sent IFP deficiency letter instead of case assignment letter. Original letter was removed before mail was picked up. (ST)
November 5, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Bruce M. Jones II (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition, #2 Affidavit of Petitioner, #3 Exhibits to Affidavit, #4 Letter from Filer)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FDC Warden I. Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce M. Jones II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?