Universal Music Corporation et al v. Dive In, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dirty Dre Music, Milksongs, Blue's Baby Music, Universal Music Corp, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Goo Eyed Music and Universal Music Corporation
Defendant: Ty Franzer, Anthony Johnson and Dive In, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01623
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 19 REPORT on the determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SWT)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 18 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal (Dkt. #17 ), and since defendants have not filed a counterclaim or answer, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
December 17, 2018 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation (Schneider, Harry)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
December 10, 2018 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Make FRCP 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures, filed by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2018, (Schneider, Harry)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Defendants Dive In, Inc., Ty Franzer, and Anthony Johnson shall have until December 31, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
November 30, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AE)
November 29, 2018 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/29/2018, (Schneider, Harry)
November 16, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dive In, Inc. on 11/9/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation. (Schneider, Harry)
November 16, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Anthony Johnson on 11/9/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation. (Schneider, Harry)
November 16, 2018 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ty Franzer on 11/9/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Blue's Baby Music, Dirty Dre Music, Goo Eyed Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Milksongs, Universal Music Corporation. (Schneider, Harry)
November 8, 2018 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (GT)
November 8, 2018 8 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Dive In, Inc., Ty Franzer, and Anthony Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
November 8, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
November 7, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Milksongs (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Goo Eyed Music (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc. (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dirty Dre Music (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Blue's Baby Music (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Music Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Universal Music Corp (Schneider, Harry)
November 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5535429) Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Blue's Baby Music(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Dirty Dre Music(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Goo Eyed Music(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Milksongs(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), filed by Milksongs, Dirty Dre Music, Blue's Baby Music, JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc., Universal Music Corp, Goo Eyed Music. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #3 Summons Dive In, Inc., #4 Summons Ty Franzer, #5 Summons Anthony Johnson)(Schneider, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Music Corporation et al v. Dive In, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirty Dre Music
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milksongs
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue's Baby Music
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAT Cat Music Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goo Eyed Music
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Franzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dive In, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?