McAuliffe v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc

Plaintiff: Kevin McAuliffe
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc and O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01628
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10. (Riley, Kyle)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/14/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2018. (AD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC mailed on 11/28/2018 (Hughes, Scott)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.(Riley, Kyle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ozark Services, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Riley, Kyle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine E Sutton on behalf of Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Sutton, Catherine)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle Dustin Riley on behalf of Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Riley, Kyle)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, filed by Kevin McAuliffe.(Hughes, Scott)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc (Riley, Kyle)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/15/2018. (SNP)
November 8, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc (Riley, Kyle)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc (Riley, Kyle)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Riley, Kyle)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-24658-0; (Receipt # 0981-5536086), filed by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAuliffe v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc
Represented By: Kyle Dustin Riley
Represented By: Catherine E Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Catherine E Sutton
Represented By: Kyle Dustin Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McAuliffe
Represented By: Scott A Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?