Walker et al v. Weyerhaeuser Company
Plaintiff: Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Lori Ashcraft, Shalini Shreedhar, Rachel Rudiger, Keven Wing, Robert Michaud, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Renee Wing, Derek Alquist, Shauna Calabrase, Toby Athron, Brian Ashcraft, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Shaheen Athron, Magdalen Alquist, Shawn Calabrase and Lindsey Davis
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01637
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint stipulation #30 , the Court HEREBY ORDERS that all proceedings in this action are stayed for purposes of settlement until March 29, 2019. On or before March 29, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint status report apprising the Court as to the status of the settlement and, if the settlement has been accepted, shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to the schedule agreed to in the Settlement Agreement. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (HR)
December 27, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement by parties (Terrell, Beth)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER #28 regarding joint stipulation filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. Having reviewed the stipulation, the Court HEREBY extends the deadline for Weyerhaeuser Company to respond to the Amended Complaint to Friday, January 25, 2019. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (HR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to complaint by parties (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 19, 2018 Attorney Beth E Terrell for Derek Alquist,Beth E Terrell for Magdalen Alquist,Beth E Terrell for Brian Ashcraft,Beth E Terrell for Lori Ashcraft,Beth E Terrell for Shaheen Athron,Beth E Terrell for Toby Athron,Beth E Terrell for Shauna Calabrase,Beth E Terrell for Shawn Calabrase,Beth E Terrell for Lindsey Davis,Beth E Terrell for Owen Davis,Beth E Terrell for Mary Michaud,Beth E Terrell for Robert Michaud,Beth E Terrell for Rachel Rudiger,Beth E Terrell for Shalini Shreedhar,Beth E Terrell for Shreedhar Thimmegowda,Beth E Terrell for Keven Wing,Beth E Terrell for Renee Wing added; per #25 Praecipe to Attach Document,. (TH)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Corrected Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles E Schaffer for Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing and Renee Wing, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 CORRECTED APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles E. Schaffer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing Receipt No. 0981-5586327 (Terrell, Beth) Modified on 12/19/2018 to modify title of document (CDA).
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 PRAECIPE to attach document re #19 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing (Attachments: #1 Corrected Signature Page to First Amended Complaint)(Terrell, Beth)
December 18, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #19 Amended Complaint was improperly signed by Beth Terrell. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (TH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles E. Schaffer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5586327 (Terrell, Beth)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lawrence Deutsch for Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jacob M Polakoff for Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lawrence Deutsch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5574506 (Terrell, Beth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jacob M. Polakoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Derek Alquist, Magdalen Alquist, Brian Ashcraft, Lori Ashcraft, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shauna Calabrase, Shawn Calabrase, Lindsey Davis, Owen Davis, Mary Michaud, Robert Michaud, Rachel Rudiger, Shalini Shreedhar, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Keven Wing, Renee Wing (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5574495 (Terrell, Beth)
December 6, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). Weyerhaeuser Company with JURY DEMAND Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Shawn Calabrase(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Shauna Calabrase(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Lori Ashcraft(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Brian Ashcraft(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Rachel Rudiger(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Shreedhar Thimmegowda(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Shalini Shreedhar(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Magdalen Alquist(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Derek Alquist(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Toby Athron(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Shaheen Athron(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Lindsey Davis(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Owen Davis(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Keven Wing(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Renee Wing(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Robert Michaud(pty:pla), Attorney E. Michelle Drake added to party Mary Michaud(pty:pla), filed by Courtney Walker, Michael Walker, Mary Michaud, Keven Wing, Brian Ashcraft, Renee Wing, Derek Alquist, Rachel Rudiger, Lindsey Davis, Lori Ashcraft, Shreedhar Thimmegowda, Shaheen Athron, Toby Athron, Shawn Calabrase, Owen Davis, Magdalen Alquist, Shauna Calabrase, Shalini Shreedhar, Robert Michaud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Drake, E.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert C Collins, III for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mary Rose Alexander for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark S Mester for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert C. Collins III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5568095 (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mary Rose Alexander FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5568051 (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark S. Mester FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5567997 (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline to response to complaint. The deadline for Weyerhaeuser Company to respond to the complaint is extended to Wednesday, January 9, 2019. signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order, filed by Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. Noting Date 12/3/2018, (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
November 30, 2018 Attorney Steve Y Koh for Weyerhaeuser Company added; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen M O'Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Weyerhaeuser Company on 11/19/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Courtney Walker, Michael Walker. (Terrell, Beth)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph Hashmall for Plaintiffs Courtney Walker and Michael Walker, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney E. Michelle Drake for Plaintiffs Courtney Walker and Michael Walker, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph C. Hashmall FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Courtney Walker, Michael Walker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5549446 (Terrell, Beth)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY E. Michelle Drake FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Courtney Walker, Michael Walker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5549438 (Terrell, Beth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:17-cv-01501 RSL, by Plaintiffs Courtney Walker, Michael Walker. (Terrell, Beth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SG)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (SG) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/14/2018 with case number) (SG).
November 13, 2018 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against defendant(s) Weyerhaeuser Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5539851) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Courtney Walker(pty:pla), Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Michael Walker(pty:pla), filed by Michael Walker, Courtney Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Weyerhaeuser Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Walker
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: Joseph Hashmall
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Walker
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: Joseph Hashmall
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ashcraft
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalini Shreedhar
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Rudiger
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keven Wing
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michaud
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Davis
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Michaud
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Wing
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Alquist
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Calabrase
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Athron
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ashcraft
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shreedhar Thimmegowda
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheen Athron
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalen Alquist
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Calabrase
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Davis
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Jacob M Polakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Robert C Collins, III
Represented By: Mark S Mester
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?