Sound Excursions LLC v. 5KEvents.Org LLC

Plaintiff: Sound Excursions, LLC and Sound Excursions LLC
Defendant: 5KEvents.Org LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01649
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Extension of Time. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26 Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Sound Excursions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walters, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/3/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on 5KEvents.org LLC on 11/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sound Excursions LLC. (Getzoff, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy P Getzoff for Plaintiff Sound Excursions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy P. Getzoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sound Excursions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5552194 (Walters, Mark)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant 5KEvents.Org LLC (GT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (GT)
November 15, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sound Excursions, LLC (Walters, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant 5KEvents.Org LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5542173), filed by Sound Excursions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #8 Summons(Walters, Mark) Modified on 11/15/2018 to correct party complaint filed against(GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sound Excursions LLC v. 5KEvents.Org LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sound Excursions, LLC
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sound Excursions LLC
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Represented By: Timothy P Getzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5KEvents.Org LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?