Brisbois v. Tulalip Tribal Court et al

Petitioner: Tyrone Grant Brisbois
Respondent: Snohomish County Jail, Tulalip Tribal Court and Tony Aston
Case Number: 2:2018cv01677
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
1 Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Attorney Sean D. Reay for Tony Aston added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
December 11, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sean D. Reay on behalf of Respondent Snohomish County Jail. (Reay, Sean)
December 6, 2018 6 Prison Trust Account Statement (TH)
December 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy Tenney on behalf of Petitioner Tyrone Grant Brisbois. (Tenney, Nancy)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE 2241 PETITION, ANSWER, AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by 1st Class Mail to Respondent Tony Aston,Chief of Snohomish County Jail, Tulalip Prosecutor's Office, Snohomish County Prosecutor's Office and Federal Public Defender on 11/30/2018. (cc: Petitioner served via USPS)(copy of Petition forwarded to FPD)(SG)
November 28, 2018 3 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # SEA093562), filed by Tyrone Grant Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SG)
November 28, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (SG)
November 28, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number SEA093562 (SG)
November 23, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/24/2018 to correct. (sent to petitioner via USPS) (ST)
November 20, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Tyrone Grant Brisbois (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brisbois v. Tulalip Tribal Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Snohomish County Jail
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tulalip Tribal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony Aston
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Grant Brisbois
Represented By: Nancy Tenney
Represented By: Michael Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?