Allah v. Sherfey

Petitioner: Allah
Respondent: Paul L. Sherfey
Case Number: 2:2018cv01713
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Paul L. Sherfey against Allah **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The Court DENIES #1 2254 Petition for Habeas Corpus, DENIES a Certificate of Appealability and DENIES #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS to #4 Report and Recommendations, filed by Allah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**30 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Petitioner Allah to #4 Report and Recommendations. Noting Date 12/21/2018, **26 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(SG)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Allah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account Statement)**25 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(SG)
December 6, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(SG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2018, Noting Date 12/21/2018, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(SG)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/31/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Allah. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**22 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Allah, Prisoner ID: 950376)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allah v. Sherfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul L. Sherfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?