Neff v. Desta et al

Plaintiff: Robert Neff
Defendant: Zewdneh N. Desta, Safeway, Inc., K&B Transportation, Inc., K&B Transportation Inc, Safeway Inc, Jane Doe Desta and Zewdneh N Desta
Case Number: 2:2018cv01716
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan W Harris for Plaintiff Robert Neff, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 22, 2019 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan W. Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Robert Neff (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5622901 (Koehler, Karen)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing plaintiff's negligent training and supervision claims against defendant K&B Transportation re parties' #16 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 16, 2019 17 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 8 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 2/13/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/4/2019, Discovery completed by 11/3/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/17/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/3/2019, Motions in Limine due by 2/3/2020, Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/26/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 2/26/2020 (KERR)
January 15, 2019 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff's Negligent Training and Supervision Claims Against K&B Transportation (the remaining claims are unaffected) by parties (Sbaih, Jeff)
January 10, 2019 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 8. (Koehler, Karen)
January 3, 2019 14 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Jane Doe Desta, Zewdneh N Desta, K&B Transportation Inc.(Sbaih, Jeff)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
December 6, 2018 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. cc to RSL. (AE)
November 30, 2018 Attorney Dylan E Jackson for Jane Doe Desta, Zewdneh N Desta, and K&B Transportation Inc added per #11 Notice of Appearance. (KB)
November 30, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeff M Sbaih on behalf of Defendants Jane Doe Desta, Zewdneh N Desta, K&B Transportation Inc. (Sbaih, Jeff)
November 30, 2018 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida, if this form is not returned by 12/7/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
November 30, 2018 9 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
November 30, 2018 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
November 30, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SNP)
November 30, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by K&B Transportation, Inc. (Sbaih, Jeff)
November 29, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings, LLC for Safeway, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway, Inc. (Reppart, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Safeway, Inc. (Reppart, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Verification of State Court Records, #2 Declaration (non motion), ; filed by Defendant Safeway, Inc.. (Reppart, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration (non motion), by Defendant Safeway, Inc. (Reppart, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Reppart in Support of Defendant Safeway's Notice of Removal of Action re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Reppart, Kimberly)
November 29, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-27616-1 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5560713), filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Reppart, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neff v. Desta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zewdneh N. Desta
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Represented By: Natalie A. Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Transportation Inc
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: Kimberly Reppart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Desta
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zewdneh N Desta
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Neff
Represented By: Karen Kathryn Koehler
Represented By: Jonathan W Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?