Nava v. Sweeney et al
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Nava
Defendant: Snohomish County Jail and Sweeney
Case Number: 2:2018cv01734
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2019. (ST)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #5 COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff w/amended complaint form sent via USPS)(ST)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Jose Antonio Nava against defendant(s) Snohomish County Jail, Sweeney. (ST)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Snohomish County Corrections)(ST)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from Jose Nava re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (ST)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jose Antonio Nava. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nava v. Sweeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Nava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?