Funko LLC v. Loot Crate Inc

Plaintiff: Funko, LLC and Funko LLC
Defendant: Loot Crate, Inc. and Loot Crate Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01753
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Brown for defendant Loot Crate Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 23, 2019 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas A. Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Loot Crate Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5623751 (Bodine, Brian)
December 31, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Brian G Bodine added to party Loot Crate Inc(pty:dft) by Loot Crate Inc.(Bodine, Brian)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/4/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/19/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
December 19, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on LOOT CRATE, INC., on 12/10/2018, filed by Plaintiff Funko LLC. (Simpkins, Holly)
December 7, 2018 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
December 7, 2018 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Loot Crate Inc (SNP)
December 7, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
December 6, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Funko Holdings LLC for Funko, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Funko, LLC (Simpkins, Holly)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (1) For Trademark Infringement; False (2) False Designation of Origin; and (3) Unfair Competition against defendant(s) Loot Crate, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5570731), filed by Funko, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Simpkins, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funko LLC v. Loot Crate Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loot Crate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loot Crate Inc
Represented By: Nicholas A Brown
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funko, LLC
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funko LLC
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?