Canyon Estates Condominium Association v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Canyon Estates Condominium Association
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company and Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01761
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 8-10 court days. (Miller, Jesse)
January 15, 2019 Reset Deadlines: By agreement of the parties, the deadline to exchange Initial Disclosures is extended to 2/15/2019. (VE)
January 14, 2019 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney William F Knowles added to party Atain Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney William F Knowles added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Atain Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Knowles, William)
January 4, 2019 Attorney John Charles Ditzler for Atain Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 4, 2019 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA S.A. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Toren, Jonathan)
January 4, 2019 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Atain Specialty Insurance Company (Toren, Jonathan)
January 4, 2019 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan Toren on behalf of Defendants Atain Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Toren, Jonathan)
December 12, 2018 6 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 10, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Canyon Estates Condominium Association re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mail upon Insurance Commissioner (Miller, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Canyon Estates Condominium Association re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mail upon Insurance Commissioner (Miller, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Canyon Estates Condominium Association (Miller, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2018. (GT)
December 10, 2018 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Atain Specialty Insurance Company and Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
December 10, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5572530), filed by Canyon Estates Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Atain, #7 Summons Indian Harbor)(Miller, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canyon Estates Condominium Association v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: John Charles Ditzler
Represented By: William F Knowles
Represented By: Jonathan Toren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Charles Ditzler
Represented By: William F Knowles
Represented By: Jonathan Toren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canyon Estates Condominium Association
Represented By: Jocelyn J. Whiteley
Represented By: Zachary O McIsaac
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?