Wells Fargo Bank NA v. George et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Defendant: Lonna L Jackson and Ann R George
Case Number: 2:2018cv01769
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Attorney Mark A Trivett for Ann R George added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Duncan Calvert Turner on behalf of Defendant Ann R George. (Turner, Duncan)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Dewitt McBride on behalf of Defendant Lonna L Jackson. (McBride, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, EXHIBIT A by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA (Lyon, Wendy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Lyon, Wendy)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ann R George, Lonna L Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jackson)(KB)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Wells Fargo Bank NA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2018. (KB)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Exhibit A to Complaint. Exhibit A contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2 and FRCP 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to LCR 5.2 and FRCP 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 18-cv-5999 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 18-cv-1769. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (KB)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against defendant(s) Wells Fargo N.A. Ann R George and Lonna L Jackson. (Receipt # 0981-5570208) Attorney Wendy E Lyon added to party Wells Fargo N.A.(pty:pla), filed by Wells Fargo N.A.. (Attachments: SEALED DOCUMENT #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, part 1, #3 Exhibit B, part 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons (George), #6 Summons (Jackson))(Lyon, Wendy) Modified on 12/10/2018 to seal Exhibit A - document contains financial account number that must be redacted per FRCP 5.2. (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. George et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonna L Jackson
Represented By: James Dewitt McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann R George
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Mark A Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Wendy E Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?