Synoracki v. Alaska Airlines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Leo SYNORACKI
Defendant: Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv01784
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 38 U.S.C. § 4323
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc.(Robertson, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5-10 days. Jury Trial is set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2019, Motion for Class Certification due by 12/19/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/18/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/1/2020, Discovery completed by 5/17/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/16/2020, Motions in Limine due by 7/26/2020, Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/9/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 9/9/2020 (KERR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-10 days. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stonebarger, Gene)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc. for Alaska Airlines Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Airlines Inc (Robertson, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Air Group Inc (Robertson, Mark)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark Robertson for defendants Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, and for Does 1-10, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tristan Morales for Defendants Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, and for Does 1-10, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark Robertson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, Does 1-10 (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5606586 (Rosen, Kathryn)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tristan Morales FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, Does 1-10 (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5606577 (Rosen, Kathryn)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline re parties' #19 Stipulation: Deadline for defendants to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/7/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by parties (Rosen, Kathryn)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathryn S Rosen on behalf of Defendants Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc, Does 1-10. (Rosen, Kathryn)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Alaska Air Group, Inc. on 12/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Leo Synoracki. (Kalish, Dan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Alaska Airlines, Inc. on 12/17/2018, filed by Plaintiff Leo Synoracki. (Kalish, Dan)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald W Heyrich on behalf of Plaintiff Leo Synoracki. (Heyrich, Donald)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alaska Air Group Inc, Alaska Airlines Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian J Lawler for Leo SYNORACKI, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles M BIlly for Leo SYNORACKI, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gene J Stonebarger for Leo SYNORACKI, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Crystal L Matter for Leo SYNORACKI, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian Lawler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5578496 (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles Billy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5578177 (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gene Stonebarger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5578169 (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Crystal Matter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5578166 (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Leo SYNORACKI (Kalish, Dan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND Attorney Dan Kalish added to party Leo SYNORACKI(pty:pla), filed by Leo SYNORACKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalish, Dan) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synoracki v. Alaska Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo SYNORACKI
Represented By: Charles M BIlly
Represented By: Gene J Stonebarger
Represented By: Crystal L Matter
Represented By: Dan Kalish
Represented By: Brian J Lawler
Represented By: Donald W Heyrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group Inc
Represented By: Tristan Morales
Represented By: Kathryn S Rosen
Represented By: Mark Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Represented By: Tristan Morales
Represented By: Kathryn S Rosen
Represented By: Mark Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Tristan Morales
Represented By: Kathryn S Rosen
Represented By: Mark Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?