Cascade Designs Inc v. JAB Distributors LLC

Plaintiff: Cascade Designs Inc
Defendant: JAB Distributors, LLC and JAB Distributors LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01806
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Clerk William M. McCool granting #6 Motion for Default by Cascade Designs, Inc. Default entered against JAB Distributors, LLC. (KD)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Douglas A. Grady (First Amended) in Support of Motion for Entry of Default re #6 MOTION for Default by Plaintiff Cascade Designs Inc (Grady, Douglas)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER deferring plaintiff's #6 MOTION for Entry of Default; directing plaintiff to file an Amended Exhibit 1 to the Grady declaration (Dkt. #6 -1), with proof of service. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiff Cascade Designs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Douglas A. Grady, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/24/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/25/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cascade Designs Inc (Grady, Douglas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/24/2018. (SG)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) JAB Distributors LLC (SG)
December 17, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) JAB Distributors, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5581840) Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Cascade Designs Inc(pty:pla), filed by Cascade Designs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Grady, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascade Designs Inc v. JAB Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Designs Inc
Represented By: Anthony R Sterling
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAB Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAB Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?