The Highlands North Condominium Association
Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 and Amco Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01865
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association (Stein, Jerry)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allied Insurance Company of America, Amco Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/3/2019, if applicable. (ST)
December 27, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Declaratory Relief and Monetary Damages against defendant(s) Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Amco Insurance Company, Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5593563), filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Allied, #3 Summons Nationwide, #4 Summons Amco)(Stein, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?