Ocampo v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Plaintiff: Jason Ocampo and Jason L Ocampo
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01875
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Pursuant to the filing of parties' #28 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, the Parties have dismissed the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(1). The case is now closed. (SB)
December 5, 2022 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss & Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Jason L Ocampo. Noting Date 12/5/2022, (Ackermann, Craig)
September 1, 2022 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Ackermann, Craig)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Extending Stay. The stay is EXTENDED to 9/1/2022. The parties shall file a joint status report by 9/1/2022 or within 10 days of the Ninth Circuit's decision in Valiente v. Swift, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
January 13, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Bodien, India)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Extending Stay. The Court EXTENDS the stay for an additional 90 days. The Parties are directed to submit a joint status report before the stay expires with a proposed plan for what issues, if any, remain, and are further directed to contact the Court immediately if they reach a settlement. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Bodien, India)
October 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Raymond Morrison on behalf of Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Morrison, James)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #20 Joint Status Report. The stay remains in effect for 90 days from the date of this Order. The Parties are directed to file a joint status report before the stay expires. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
June 9, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Bodien, India)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report within 14 days of this order. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Bodien, India)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Bodien, India)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The stay order in this matter remains in effect. The parties are ordered to file an updated status report within 14 days of the ruling by the Ninth Circuit. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Bodien, India)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc (Diamond, Kenneth)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Permitting Withdrawal of Attorney for Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. re parties' #12 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that Kasey D. Huebner be and hereby is formally withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Withdrawal of Attorney by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diamond, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kasey D Huebner for Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Diamond, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kenneth J Diamond on behalf of Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. (Diamond, Kenneth)
July 25, 2019 NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal #11 was filed incorrectly. The withdrawal of Kasey D. Heubner is not proper per LCR 83.2(b)(2) which states: (2) Where there has simply been a change of counsel within the same law firm, an order of substitution is not required; the new attorney should file a Notice of Appearance and the withdrawing attorney should file a Notice of Withdrawal. However, where there is a change in counsel that effects a termination of one law office and the appearance of a new law office, the substitution must be effected in accordance with subsection (b)(1), which requires leave of court. (PM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Stay Pending Washington Supreme Court's Resolution of Certified Question. The parties shall file a joint status report every six months, beginning 8/1/2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Pending Washington Supreme Court's Resolution of Certified Question, etc., filed by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc. Noting Date 1/31/2019, (Huebner, Kasey)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA of Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Jason L Ocampo (Bodien, India)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
January 2, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (GT)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huebner, Kasey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of No Related Cases re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Huebner, Kasey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Huebner, Kasey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 18-2-55749-6SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5595974), filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint)(Huebner, Kasey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocampo v. Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ocampo
Represented By: Craig Ackermann
Represented By: Brian Walter Denlinger
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L Ocampo
Represented By: Craig Ackermann
Represented By: Brian Walter Denlinger
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Represented By: Craig J. Ackermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line Inc
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Represented By: Kenneth J Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?