Morris et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Catherine M Morris and William A Morris
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc, WARREN PUMPS, LLC., Union Carbide Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, General Electric Company, BW/IP, INC., LONE STAR INDUSTRIES, INC., ITT Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, Genuine Parts Company, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, CBS Corporation, Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., BW/IP Inc, Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC, IMO Industries Inc, Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Hanson Permanente Cement Inc, Warren Pumps LLC, Lone Star Industries Inc and Pneumo Abex LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01876
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tuvim, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint; & Affirmative Defenses by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Kero, Diane)
January 8, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Ricketts, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Morgan, Shaun)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Morgan, Shaun)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pneumo Abex LLC (Kero, Diane)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 STATE COURT RECORD and Proceedings filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Uhle, Megan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint; by Genuine Parts Company.(Uhle, Megan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ITT Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC (Gardner, Ronald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Megan Uhle on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Uhle, Megan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Reynolds, Rachel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal)(Reynolds, Rachel)
January 2, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/9/2019. (GT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
January 2, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP, INC.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BW/IP, INC. (Dinsdale, Christine)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Corliss on behalf of Plaintiffs Catherine M Morris, William A Morris. (Corliss, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Glenn S Draper on behalf of Plaintiffs Catherine M Morris, William A Morris. (Draper, Glenn)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Genuine Parts Company (Loftis, Jeanne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Loftis, Jeanne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION Megan Uhle re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Loftis, Jeanne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-55350-4 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5596390), filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Jury Demand)(Loftis, Jeanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC.
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC
Represented By: Diane J. Kero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONE STAR INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Malik Gbenro
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc.
Represented By: Malik Gbenro
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc
Represented By: Malik Gbenro
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Permanente Cement Inc
Represented By: Malik Gbenro
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Diane J. Kero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M Morris
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Represented By: David Corliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Morris
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Represented By: David Corliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?