Stanard v. Nolan et al

Plaintiff: Robert Allen Stanard
Defendant: Ian Conners, Mary M Mitchell, Nolan Sia, Dan Sproul and Nolan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00017
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon US Attorney General (TH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Robert Allen Stanard. Noted by Clerk for 3/15/2019, (TH)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Defendants on 2/7/19. (SG) Modified on 2/13/2019 - certified copies to Attorney General of the United States at Washington, DC and Office of the United States Attorney for this district 2/13/19.(SG).
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Allen Stanard.(SG)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, FCI-Sheridan)(SG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Robert Allen Stanard. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
January 16, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter (ST)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 2/7/2019 to correct (SG)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Allen Stanard (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Envelope)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanard v. Nolan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Sia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Stanard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?