Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Adkison Glazing Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Western Washington Glaziers MRP, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund, Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program, Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5 and Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Defendant: William P Adkison, Adkison Glazing Services LLC, Western Surety Co and April M Adkison
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael A Urban. Filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program, Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Western Washington Glaziers MRP, Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund. (Urban, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney VanNoy Culpepper on behalf of Defendants April M Adkison, William P Adkison, Adkison Glazing Services LLC. (Culpepper, VanNoy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant April M Adkison on 2/10/2019 (McDonald, Sean)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant William P Adkison on 2/10/2019 (McDonald, Sean)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/13/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SNP)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
January 9, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program, Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Western Washington Glaziers MRP, Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund (McDonald, Sean)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5605997) Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative (pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program (pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund (pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5(pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Western Washington Glaziers MRP(pty:pla), Attorney Sean William McDonald added to party Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund(pty:pla), filed by Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund, Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund, Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Western Washington Glaziers MRP, Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Adkison Glazing Services LLC, #3 Summons as to William P. Adkison, #4 Summons as to April M. Adkison, #5 Summons as to Western Surety Co. (via Insurance Commissioner), #6 Summons as to Western Surety Co. (via Wash. Dep't of Labor & Industries))(McDonald, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Adkison Glazing Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Glaziers MRP
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Western Glaziers Retirement Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Washington Construction Industry Substance Abuse Program
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Glaziers Org Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Adkison
Represented By: VanNoy Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adkison Glazing Services LLC
Represented By: VanNoy Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April M Adkison
Represented By: VanNoy Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?