McGlown v. Mellburg Financial Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Meredith E McGlown
Defendant: Mellburg Financial Group Inc, Ahmadayyia Foundation Inc, Hadaya Foundation Inc and Miller and Associates
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 JUDGMENT BY COURT: The above-captioned matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (SWT)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER dismissing with prejudice #14 Complaint; denying as moot plaintiff's remaining motions. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Meredith E McGlown. (Attachments: #1 Noted Explanation)(TH)
February 7, 2019 Motion Requiring More Definite Statement #12 NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 3/15/2019 (KERR)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file on or before March 13, 2019, an amended complaint that clearly and concisely identifies the acts of which defendants are accused and how these acts violated plaintiff's legal rights. The Clerk of Court is directed to place this Order Requiring More Definite Statement on the Court's calendar for consideration on Friday, March 15, 2019. (KERR)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (KERR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Serve the Subsidiaries of Mellburg Financial Grp., filed by Plaintiff Meredith E McGlown. (Attachments: #1 Subpoenas) Noted by Clerk for 2/22/2019, (TH)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Meredith E McGlown, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Meredith E McGlown.(SWT)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Identity Testing and to Produce, filed by Plaintiff Meredith E McGlown. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit) Noted by Clerk for 2/8/2019, (SWT)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Plaintiff Meredith E McGlown has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (PS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Meredith E McGlown. Noted by Clerk for 2/1/2019, (SWT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Termination of Counsel; filed by Plaintiff Meredith E McGlown. (SWT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ahmadayyia Foundation Inc, Hadaya Foundation Inc, Mellburg Financial Group Inc, Miller and Associates with JURY DEMAND, filed by Meredith E McGlown. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(SWT) Modified on 1/14/2019 to list additional defendant (KB).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; recommending the complaint be reviewed before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A. Tsuchida, filed by Meredith E McGlown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Appearance and Termination of Counsel, #6 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(SNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlown v. Mellburg Financial Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellburg Financial Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmadayyia Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadaya Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith E McGlown
Represented By: Meredith E McGlown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?