Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund et al v. Thornton
Plaintiff: Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund, Western Washington Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund and Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund
Defendant: Ed Thornton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (PM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund, Western Washington Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund (Reid, Russell)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Ed Thornton (SNP)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/18/2019. (SNP)
January 11, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds and Union Dues against defendant(s) Ed Thornton (Receipt # 0981-5608071), filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund, Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Western Washington Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund et al v. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?