Rotchford v. Jewitt et al

Plaintiff: Fraser Rotchford
Defendant: Steven Jewitt, Mira Narkiewicsz, Kennedy, Marlinda Praden, Doyle, Chrissy and Male Psychologist
Case Number: 2:2019cv00041
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: James P Donohue
2 Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL JUDGE by Clerk William M. McCool. Referral Judge is Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. Donohue's successor, Magistrate Judge Michelle L. Peterson. Cc to MLP. (AE) cc: Rotchford
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER striking plaintiff's #8 Addendum; and granting plaintiff thirty (30) days from the date on which this Order is signed to file an amended complaint. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff with Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Addendum re #6 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Fraser Rotchford (SG) Modified on 2/28/2019 correct filing date( and link to Dkt #6 (SG).
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2019, (SG)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. James P. Donohue. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint curing the above-noted deficiency within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is signed. (cc: Order and form mailed to plaintiff via USPS)(SG)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fraser Rotchford.(SG)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Jefferson County Jail) by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Donohue, filed by Fraser Rotchford. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
January 25, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter, (ST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 2/11/2019 to correct. (mailed to plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotchford v. Jewitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mira Narkiewicsz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlinda Praden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrissy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Male Psychologist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraser Rotchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?