Burch v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Justine Burch
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00047
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah)
February 4, 2019 Attorney Gabriel Baker for Aetna Life Insurance Company added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E Swale on behalf of Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C.Coughenour. (PP)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company (GT)
January 14, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Aetna Life Insurance Company (Receipt # 0981-5610288), filed by Justine Burch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Engle, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Burch
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?