Woodell v. Expedia Inc et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Woodell
Defendant: Travelscape, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com L.P., EAN.com, LP, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC, EAN.com LP and Expedia Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 6/10/2019; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 7/10/2019. (AD)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/26/2019. (AD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Hotels.com LP mailed on 1/16/2019 (Berman, Steve)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Travelscape LLC mailed on 1/16/2019 (Berman, Steve)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant EAN.com LP mailed on 1/16/2019 (Berman, Steve)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Expedia Inc mailed on 1/16/2019 (Berman, Steve)
January 28, 2019 Attorneys Patricia A Eakes and Emily Dodds Powell for EAN.com LP, Expedia Inc, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendants EAN.com LP, Expedia Inc, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC. (Calfo, Angelo)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER transferring case as related to C18-1812-JLR, to the Honorable James L. Robart. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C19-51-JLR. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)CC to JLR
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew M Volk on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Woodell. (Volk, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 18-1812, by Plaintiff Patricia Woodell. (Berman, Steve)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) EAN.com LP, Expedia Inc, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SNP)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
January 14, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) EAN.com, LP, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Travelscape, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5610631) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Patricia Woodell(pty:pla), filed by Patricia Woodell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Expedia, #3 Summons Summons - EAN.com, #4 Summons Summons - Travelscape LLC, #5 Summons Summons - Hotels.com)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodell v. Expedia Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelscape, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN.com, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com LP
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelscape LLC
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN.com LP
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Inc
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Woodell
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Andrew M Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?