United States of America v. Buckardt et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: D'Skell Agape Society, Snohomish County, Karen A Buckardt, Elmer J Buckardt, KA Buckardt and EJ Buckardt
Case Number: 2:2019cv00052
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones granting the parties' #7 Stipulated MOTION Re: Relative Priority Of Liens Against Subject Properties Between United States and Snohomish County. (VE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #8 Response to Motion, #7 Stipulated MOTION Re: Relative Priority Of Liens Against Subject Properties Between United States and Snohomish County, #9 Notice of Lis Pendens /Amended Certificate of Service for Dkt. # 7, 8, and 9 (Tran, Yen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tran, Yen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff United States of America, to #4 MOTION to Extend Date of Summon in a Civil Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tran, Yen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION Re: Relative Priority Of Liens Against Subject Properties Between United States and Snohomish County, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/27/2019, (Tran, Yen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rebecca J Guadamud on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County. (Guadamud, Rebecca)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Snohomish County on 2/6/2019 (Tran, Yen)
February 26, 2019 Noting Date Set: Defendants' #4 MOTION to Extend Date of Summon in a Civil Action is noted for 3/8/2019, pursuant to LCR 7(d)(2). (cc: Defendants via first class mail) (VE)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Date of Summon in a Civil Action, filed by Defendants Elmer J Buckardt, Karen A Buckardt. (TH)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Elmer J Buckardt, Karen A Buckardt, D'Skell Agape Society, Snohomish County (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SNP)
January 14, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Yen Jeannette Tran added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Elmer J. Buckardt, #3 Summons Karen A. Buckardt, #4 Summons D'Skell Agape Society, #5 Summons Snohomish County)(Tran, Yen) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Buckardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Skell Agape Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Rebecca J Guadamud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A Buckardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmer J Buckardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KA Buckardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Buckardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yen Jeannette Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?