Washington Cities Insurance Authority v. Ironshore Indemnity Inc

Plaintiff: Washington Cities Insurance Authority
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00054
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5-8 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/4/2019, Discovery completed by 2/3/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2020, Motions in Limine due by 5/4/2020, Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2020, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 5/26/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-8. (Beecher, Brent)
March 1, 2019 The Court acknowledges receipt of Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc.'s #13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:15-cv-05346BJR. The Court declines to transfer this case to Judge Rothstein. (VE)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:15-cv-05346, by Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc. (Adams, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc (Adams, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant Ironshore Indeminty, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Ironshore Indemnity Inc.(Adams, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/27/2019, Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William C Morison for Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William C. Morison FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5640890 (Adams, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Adams on behalf of Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc. (Adams, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Service by Plaintiff Washington Cities Insurance Authority (Cordell, Franklin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington Cities Insurance Authority (Ashbaugh, J)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Franklin Dennis Cordell. Filed by Plaintiff Washington Cities Insurance Authority. (Cordell, Franklin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc (SNP)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/22/2019. (SNP)
January 14, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5610949), filed by Washington Cities Insurance Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cordell, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Cities Insurance Authority v. Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Represented By: Matthew S Adams
Represented By: William C Morison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Cities Insurance Authority
Represented By: J William Ashbaugh
Represented By: Miles C Bludorn
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Brent W Beecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?