Rawlins v. Tambe

Plaintiff: Keith Rawlins
Defendant: Henry Tambe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00093
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Henry Tambe mailed on 1/29/2019 (Ballard, Jonathan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan Ballard on behalf of Defendant Henry Tambe. (Ballard, Jonathan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST REQUEST by Plaintiff Keith Rawlins for Production of Documents (no envelope received when routed to case admin. for docketing) (PM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for issuance of subpoena and OBJECTION to the #7 Order denying appointment of counsel, filed by Plaintiff Keith Rawlins. Noted by Clerk for 3/8/2019, (PM)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff via USPS)(ST)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Henry Tambe on 1/29/2019. (cc: plaintiff; Skagit County Prosecuting Attorney's Office via USPS) (ST) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/29/2019) (ST)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Keith Rawlins. (ST)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Henry Tambe, filed by Keith Rawlins.(ST)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Skagit County Justice Center via USPS)(ST)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (sent to plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Keith Rawlins. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawlins v. Tambe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rawlins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Tambe
Represented By: Jonathan Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?