Northwest Administrators Inc v. Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc

Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00101
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Northwest Administrators Inc.(Leahy, Thomas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acceptance of Service re #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ; filed by Counter Claimant Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc. (Zielinski, Benjamin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc (Zielinski, Benjamin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc by Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zielinski, Benjamin)
February 7, 2019 Attorney Richard B Keeton for Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin T Zielinski on behalf of Defendant Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc. (Zielinski, Benjamin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Phil Saro on 2/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, at the request of plaintiff's counsel, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET from 4/23/2019 tp 5/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc (SWT)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc re #4 Notice of Appearance (Leahy, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas A Leahy on behalf of Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Leahy, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
January 24, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc (Receipt # 0981-5624044), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Represented By: Thomas A Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Ford Hyundai Inc
Represented By: Richard B Keeton
Represented By: Benjamin T Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?