Slack v. Woodbury et al

Plaintiff: Tommie Slack
Defendant: Elliot, Sgt. Merritt, Micheal, James, Captain Woodbury, Dave, James Mattmann, Micheal Browning, Michael Preiss, Namon Merritt, Jr, Cesar Garcia, David Knutzen, Eliud Rodriguez and Michael Woodbury
Case Number: 2:2019cv00159
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Tommie Slack. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(SG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #14 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Tommie Slack to #13 Report and Recommendations,(Service of corrected image is attached). **37 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(SG) Modified on 3/21/2019 regenerated notice upon receipt of Notice of Change of Address)(SG). (Main Document 15 replaced on 3/22/2019) pages upside down - corrected image(SG).
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COURT/OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Tommie Slack to #13 Report and Recommendations,. Noting Date 4/5/2019, **37 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(SG) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/21/2019) (SG). (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/22/2019) pages upside down-corrected image(SG).
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Notice of Removal #6 MOTION OBJECTING TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT . Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2019, Noting Date 4/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order Adopting Report and Recommendation)**8 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST) Modified on 3/20/2019 to modify document relationship (KB).
March 4, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #12 . RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to Transferring Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tommie Slack. (Attachments: #1 Letter)**9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of T. Shane Harrison re #10 Response to #6 Motion, by Defendants Micheal Browning, Dave, Cesar Garcia, James, David Knutzen, James Mattmann, Namon Merritt, Jr, Micheal, Michael Preiss, Eliud Rodriguez, Michael Woodbury **PRINT ALL**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(Harrison, Tianni) Modified on 3/5/2019 to add link to motion (PM).
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Defendants Micheal Browning, Dave, Cesar Garcia, James, David Knutzen, James Mattmann, Namon Merritt, Jr, Micheal, Michael Preiss, Eliud Rodriguez, Michael Woodbury, to #6 MOTION re #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**PRINT ALL**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(Harrison, Tianni)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Response from the Court re Objection to Removal from State Court filed by Plaintiff Tommie Slack. **NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF** Noting Date re #6 Plaintiff's Motion Objection to Removal from State Court is set for 3/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Tommie Slack returned as Undeliverable re #4 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only). (See Minute Entry. Judge Assignment Letter regenerated to plaintiff at WCC on 2/6/19) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
February 13, 2019 Noting Date Set re #6 Plaintiff's Defendant's MOTION re #1 Notice of Removal: Noting Date 3/8/2019. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(AE) Modified on 2/20/2019 to edit name of party who filed motion. (ST)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Micheal Browning, Dave, Cesar Garcia, James, David Knutzen, James Mattmann, Namon Merritt, Jr, Micheal, Michael Preiss, Eliud Rodriguez, Michael Woodbury.**PRINT ALL**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(Harrison, Tianni)
February 6, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY: Plaintiff originally in King County Jail when state court complaint was filed. Documents received on 2/6/19 indicate that the plaintiff is now housed at the Washington Corrections Center. Docket updated with new address. The #4 Letter from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment regenerated electronically to plaintiff. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION OBJECTING TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff Tommie Slack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**75 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tommie Slack, Prisoner ID: 282904)(ST)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT. This form must be received by the court no later than February 20, 2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)cc: T. Slack
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
February 5, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Dave, Elliot, James, Merritt, Micheal, Micheal, Captain Woodbury (Harrison, Tianni)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-57958-9 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5638285) Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Dave(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Elliot(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party James(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Merritt(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Micheal(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Micheal(pty:dft), Attorney Tianni Shane Harrison added to party Captain Woodbury(pty:dft), filed by Micheal, Merritt, James, Captain Woodbury, Dave, Elliot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Tianni) Modified on 2/5/2019 to add description of attachment #2. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slack v. Woodbury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Merritt
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Woodbury
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mattmann
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Browning
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Preiss
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namon Merritt, Jr
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Garcia
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Knutzen
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliud Rodriguez
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Woodbury
Represented By: Tianni Shane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?