Gonzalez v. Crete Carrier Corporation
Plaintiff: John P Gonzalez
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00186
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 PRAECIPE re #19 Declaration of Jaime N. Cole by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaime N. Cole)(Cole, Jaime)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jaime N. Cole filed by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cole, Jaime)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Cole, Jaime)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Craig Ackermann filed by Plaintiff John P Gonzalez re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Bodien, India)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John P Gonzalez, to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order ISO Response)(Bodien, India)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jaime N Cole for Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation from April 5-14 and June 17-21. (Cole, Jaime)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin Feerhusen filed by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Cole, Jaime)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/29/2019, (Cole, Jaime)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff John P Gonzalez re #6 Discovery and Depositions Order (Bodien, India)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #10 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 3/7/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation. Noting Date 2/14/2019, (Cole, Jaime)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crete Carrier Corporation (Cole, Jaime)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laurence A Shapero on behalf of Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation. (Shapero, Laurence)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 6/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Crete Carrier Corporation must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/15/2019. (GT)
February 8, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Justin Feerhusen re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation (Cole, Jaime)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cole, Jaime)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00231-0-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5643933), filed by Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint - Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Cole, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Crete Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Laurence A Shapero
Represented By: Jaime N Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Gonzalez
Represented By: Craig Ackermann
Represented By: Brian Walter Denlinger
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?