Roberts et al v. National Beverage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Adrienne Roberts and Darryl Roberts
Defendant: National Beverage Corporation dba Shasta Beverage Incorporated, Cassie Heaton, Nicholas Heaton and National Beverage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00194
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Attorney Shelby Renee Stoner added as counsel for Cassie Heaton, Nicholas Heaton, National Beverage Corporation per #6 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Stephen Filipini on behalf of Defendants Cassie Heaton, Nicholas Heaton, National Beverage Corporation. (Filipini, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/21/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 13, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Cassie Heaton, Nicholas Heaton, National Beverage Corporation dba Shasta Beverage Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Filipini, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cassie Heaton, Nicholas Heaton, National Beverage Corporation dba Shasta Beverage Incorporated (Filipini, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-00775-3 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5645780), filed by Nicholas Heaton, Cassie Heaton, National Beverage Corporation dba Shasta Beverage Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Filipini, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. National Beverage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beverage Corporation dba Shasta Beverage Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Stephen Filipini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Heaton
Represented By: Mark Stephen Filipini
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: Shelby Renee Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Heaton
Represented By: Mark Stephen Filipini
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: Shelby Renee Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beverage Corporation
Represented By: Mark Stephen Filipini
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Represented By: Shelby Renee Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Roberts
Represented By: Chellie M Hammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Roberts
Represented By: Chellie M Hammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?