Hernandez v. Franklin Credit Management Corporation et al

Defendant / Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Company and Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Nazario Hernandez
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00207
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Bankrutpcy Appeal NOTED on motion calendar for 6/21/2019; re #5 Bankruptcy Certificate of Record. (TH)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 5/6/2019, Appellee Response Brief due by 6/5/2019, Appellant Reply Brief due by 6/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 ROA). J. Grimm.(Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea),)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Deficiency. Internal Appeal #19-S003 ; filed by Interested Party Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA) (Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea), JG)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #2 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal. The deadline for Appellant to file the designation of record and issues on appeal under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure is extended by one day to 2/26/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, filed by Plaintiff/Appellant Nazario Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/27/2019, (DeGraaff, Jacob)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS AP 18-01159, Internal Appeal # 19-S003 (Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea), )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Franklin Credit Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank National Company
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nazario Hernandez
Represented By: Jacob Daniel DeGraaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?