Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Stripe Rite Inc et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust and International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Defendant: SLI, LLC, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), Steven M Bateman, Garth Glasman, Stripe Rite, Inc., Does & Roes I-X, Stripe Rite Inc and SLI LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00223
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days. BENCH TRIAL is set for 1/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2019, Discovery completed by 9/30/2019, Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2019, Motions in Limine due by 12/30/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2020, Trial briefs, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/21/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), SLI LLC, Stripe Rite Inc (Lees, Judd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-5. (McDonald, Sean)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Steven M Bateman, Does & Roes I-X, Garth Glasman, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), SLI LLC, Stripe Rite Inc.(Lees, Judd)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/28/2019, Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Judd H Lees on behalf of Defendants Steven M Bateman, Does & Roes I-X, Garth Glasman, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), SLI LLC, Stripe Rite Inc. (Lees, Judd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Stripe Rite Inc, SLI LLC, Steven M Bateman, Garth Glasman, and Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GT)
February 19, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5 (Smith, Wesley)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Steven M Bateman, Garth Glasman, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), SLI, LLC, Stripe Rite, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5653646) Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5(pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Stripe Rite, Inc., #3 Summons SLI, LLC, #4 Summons Steven M. Bateman, #5 Summons Garth Glasman, #6 Summons Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual))(Smith, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Stripe Rite Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M Bateman
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Glasman
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe Rite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does & Roes I-X
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe Rite Inc
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLI LLC
Represented By: Judd H Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No. 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 5
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Represented By: Sean William McDonald
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?