Faletogo v. City of Seattle et al

Plaintiff: Mane Faletogo
Defendant: jared keller, City of Seatle and City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2019cv00247
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 PRAECIPE re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Jared Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Christie, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER striking in part as moot, granting in part defendant City of Seattle's #11 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint shall be electronically filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/31/2019, Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit B to the Declaration of William Neale in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Jared Keller. inre #17 Declaration. (Christie, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of William T.C. Neale filed by Defendant Jared Keller re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Christie, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant Jared Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Christie, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Sharifi, Ghazal)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Amanda M. Searle filed by Plaintiff Mane Faletogo re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Beauregard, Lincoln)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Mane Faletogo, to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Beauregard, Lincoln)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jared Keller.(Christie, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/12/2019, (Sharifi, Ghazal)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Robert L. Christie, on behalf of Officer Jared Keller, on 2/26/2019. (Beauregard, Lincoln)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/29/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kerala Thie Cowart on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Cowart, Kerala)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ghazal Sharifi on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Sharifi, Ghazal)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erika J Evans on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Evans, Erika)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendant Jared Keller. (Christie, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda M Searle on behalf of Plaintiff Mane Faletogo. (Searle, Amanda)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle, Jared Keller (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
February 21, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5658489) Attorney Lincoln C Beauregard added to party Mane Faletogo(pty:pla), filed by Mane Faletogo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Beauregard, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faletogo v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jared keller
Represented By: Robert Leslie Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seatle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Represented By: Erika J Evans
Represented By: Kerala Thie Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mane Faletogo
Represented By: Lincoln C Beauregard
Represented By: Amanda M Searle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?