Sardinas v. United Airlines et al

Plaintiff: Paula Sardinas
Defendant: United Airlines Inc, John and Jane Does 1-10 and United Airlines
Case Number: 2:2019cv00257
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Paula Sardinas, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION for Leave to File Jury Demand (Daheim, Samuel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen filed by Defendant United Airlines re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Jury Demand (Jorgensen, Caryn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendant United Airlines, to #9 MOTION for Leave to File Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jorgensen, Caryn)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *7 days*. Bench Trial is set for 7/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/22/2020, Motions due by 2/21/2020, Discovery completed by 3/23/2020, Dispositive motions due by 4/21/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/21/2020, Motions in Limine due by 6/8/2020, Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2020, Deposition Designations due by 7/1/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/13/2020, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 7/13/2020. (AD)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7. Filed by Plaintiff Paula Sardinas.(Daheim, Samuel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Samuel J. Daheim filed by Plaintiff Paula Sardinas re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Jury Demand (Daheim, Samuel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Paula Sardinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/12/2019, (Daheim, Samuel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by United Airlines.(Jorgensen, Caryn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant United Airlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Wallace, Rachael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/29/2019. (AD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Julie Anne Kays for Plaintiff Paula Sardinas from 02/27/2019 - 03/10/2019. (Kays, Julie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 25, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Continental Holdings Inc for United Airlines. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United Airlines (Wallace, Rachael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Rachael R. Wallace re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant United Airlines (Wallace, Rachael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 19-2-01663-9 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5661526), filed by United Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wallace, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardinas v. United Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Sardinas
Represented By: Samuel J Daheim
Represented By: Julie Anne Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc
Represented By: Rachael R Wallace
Represented By: John T Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Represented By: Rachael R Wallace
Represented By: John T Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?