Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Gifford Industries Inc

Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington and Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Defendant: Gifford Industries Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00258
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Gifford Industries Inc.(Walker, E)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Gifford Industries, Inc. via Harvey Gifford, its registered agent on 3/1/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney E Allen Walker on behalf of Defendant Gifford Industries Inc. (Walker, E)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Gifford Industries Inc. (GT)
February 25, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF AND FOR MONETARY DAMAGES against defendant(s) Gifford Industries Inc (Receipt # 0981-5661582) Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), filed by Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Gifford Industries, Inc.)(Maxwell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Gifford Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gifford Industries Inc
Represented By: E Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?