Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund et al v. Alaska Industrial LLC

Plaintiff: Alaska Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund, Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund and Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund
Defendant: Alaska Industrial LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00274
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Declaration (Return of Service): edited text to include type of document, name of Defendant and date subpoena was served. (PM)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service of Jack Dayton, Civilian Process Server re: Subpoena Duces Tecum; served 4/3/2019 on Alaska Industrial LLC, by Plaintiffs Alaska Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund, Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund (Reid, Russell) Modified on 4/22/2019 to include what, on whom and when document was served (PM).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DEFAULT - Granting #5 Motion for Default against Defendant Alaska Industrial, LLC. Entered by U.S. District Court Clerk (RM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Against Alaska Industrial LLC, filed by Plaintiffs Alaska Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund, Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pp 4-5 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/27/2019, (Reid, Russell)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/29/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Alaska Industrial LLC on 3/1/2019 (Reid, Russell)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/5/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alaska Industrial LLC (SNP)
February 26, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds and Union Dues against defendant(s) Alaska Industrial LLC (Receipt # 0981-5663792), filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund, Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund, Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers, Alaska Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund et al v. Alaska Industrial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Operating Engineers-Employers Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 302 International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers Construction Industry Health and Security Fund
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Industrial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?