Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc et al v. Jamison and McFarland LLC et al

Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Pal Park Music, Center City Music and Ray Vaughan Music Inc
Defendant: Shimon Shriki, Michelle Shriki, Jamison and McFarland, LLC and Jamison and McFarland LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00281
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Michelle Shriki (SWT)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, (Michelle Shriki) by Plaintiffs Center City Music, Pal Park Music, Ray Vaughan Music Inc, Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc (Schneider, Harry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Universal Music Group, Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc (Schneider, Harry)
February 27, 2019 Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (ST)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jamison and McFarland LLC, Michelle Shriki, Shimon Shriki (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (ST)
February 26, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (ST)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Center City Music, Pal Park Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc (Schneider, Harry)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5664425) Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Center City Music(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Pal Park Music(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Harry H Schneider, Jr added to party Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc(pty:pla), filed by Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Pal Park Music, Center City Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #4 Summons Jamison and McFarland LLC, #5 Summons Shimon Shriki, #6 Summons Michelle Shriki)(Schneider, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc et al v. Jamison and McFarland LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shimon Shriki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Shriki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamison and McFarland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamison and McFarland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing Inc
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pal Park Music
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center City Music
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music Inc
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?