Lopez v. Brennan

Plaintiff: Ma Cristina Lopez
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and Megan J Brennan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00287
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster General, c/o Brian T. Moran, United States Attorney on 3/6/2019, filed by Plaintiff Ma Cristina Lopez. (Albert, Gregory)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Megan J Brennan (AE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint for damages by Plaintiff Ma Cristina Lopez (Albert, Gregory)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Ma Cristina Lopez. (Albert, Gregory)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint and #3 Notice to Filer. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
February 27, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against defendant(s) Megan J. Brennan with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5666506), filed by Ma Cristina Lopez.(Albert, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ma Cristina Lopez
Represented By: Gregory W Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?