Moore v. United States et al

Plaintiff: David A Moore
Defendant: King County Civil Rights Officers, King County Risk Management Officers, Seattle Police Department, United States, Harborview Medical Hospitals, King County Public Health Department, King County Office Public Defense, Seattle Civil Rights Officers, King County Sheriff Officers, King CountyMetro and Sound Transit, Screen Technologies, King County Jail, Coughenour, Federal Public Defender Officers, King County Superior Court, King County Ombudsman Officers and Tsuchida
Case Number: 2:2019cv00293
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to amend complaint: Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff may submit an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies; denying without prejudice plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel; striking noting date of plaintiff's #5 Ex Parte Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Permanent Injunction and Damages. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Coughenour, Federal Public Defender Officers, Harborview Medical Hospitals, King County Civil Rights Officers, King County Jail, King County Office Public Defense, King County Ombudsman Officers, King County Public Health Department, King County Risk Management Officers, King County Sheriff Officers, King County Superior Court, King CountyMetro and Sound Transit, Screen Technologies, Seattle Civil Rights Officers, Seattle Police Department, Tsuchida, United States, filed by David A Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SWT)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS re plaintiff's #4 Motion. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff, King County Jail, WAWD Finance)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 JUDICIAL NOTICE of the "Does" of the Defendant(s)- Respondent(s) filed by Plaintiff David A Moore. (ST)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff David A Moore. (ST)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by David A Moore. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
April 1, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, (ST)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 4/1/2019 to correct (SG)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff David A Moore (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Rights Complaint-American with Disabilities Act, #2 Proposed Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Documents)(SG) (per Court - documents to receive file date with Mail stamp date of 11/23/18)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Civil Rights Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Risk Management Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harborview Medical Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Public Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Office Public Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Civil Rights Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Sheriff Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King CountyMetro and Sound Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screen Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coughenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Public Defender Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Ombudsman Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsuchida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?