Demos v. Obenland

Petitioner: John Robert Demos
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Case Number: 2:2019cv00343
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern, Case Number 2:19-cv-00378;.
March 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on John Robert Demos. (Plummer, M) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/06/19 ORDERING the court has not ruled on petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis and motion for appointment of counsel. CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court, Western District of Washington. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/7/2019 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents served on John Robert Demos. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Robert Demos. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel by John Robert Demos. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by John Robert Demos.(Becknal, R) [Transferred from caed on 3/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Robert Demos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?