Mass Engineered Design Inc v. Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd
Plaintiff: Mass Engineered Design, Inc. and Mass Engineered Design Inc
Defendant: Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. and Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv00677
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Limited to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re parties' #18 Stipulated Motion. Defendant Atdec Distribution USA PTY Limited shall have until 7/17/2019 to file its timely Answer and/or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 Second Stipulated MOTION and proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Limited to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. Noting Date 6/28/2019, (Poligo, Jenna)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 8/19/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/5/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/12/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew T Oliver for Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew T. Oliver FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5792258 (Poligo, Jenna)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPLATION and ORDER granting parties' #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant Atdec Distribution USA PTY Limited shall have until 7/3/19 to file its timely Answer and/or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. Noting Date 6/3/2019, (Poligo, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jenna M Poligo on behalf of Defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. (Poligo, Jenna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd on 5/13/2019 (Ranallo, Nicholas)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen F Schlather for Plaintiff Mass Engineered Design Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mass Engineered Design Inc (Ranallo, Nicholas)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John J Edmonds for Plaintiff Mass Engineered Design Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. (GT)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/14/2019. (GT)
May 7, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen F. Schlather FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mass Engineered Design, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5757093 (Ranallo, Nicholas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John J. Edmonds FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mass Engineered Design, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5757089 (Ranallo, Nicholas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5756750) Attorney Nicholas R. Ranallo added to party Mass Engineered Design, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Mass Engineered Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Ranallo, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mass Engineered Design Inc v. Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atdec Distribution USA Pty Ltd
Represented By: Andrew T Oliver
Represented By: Jenna M Poligo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mass Engineered Design, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ranallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mass Engineered Design Inc
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ranallo
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?